Financial history THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR PARASITOLOGY

Charity number: 1171659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £98.17k £63.65k £111.09k £163.70k £145.13k
Total expenditure £98.02k £50.38k £131.65k £167.74k £153.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A