Trustees THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR PARASITOLOGY
Charity number: 1171659

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Joanne Veronica Hamilton | Chair | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Guy Oldrieve | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Marie Briggs | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Phillippa Price | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Martin Llewellyn | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vyacheslav Yurchenko | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicolas Pionnier | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul McCusker | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Calvin Tiengwe | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dong XIa | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Poppy Helen Louise Lamberton | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bridget Joanne Power | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr James LaCourse | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Justin Alexander Pachebat | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.