OPENEDGE-TRANSFORMING CONFLICT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UK: 1. Public workshops, presentations, training. 2. Consultancy, training and events with other organisations/groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- France
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 30 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rakesh Prashara | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anish Chhibber | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN MARK GOUGH | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bazely | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.39k | £16.14k | £19.49k | £19.82k | £65.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.60k | £7.76k | £15.02k | £27.05k | £59.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Jan 2018 as amended on 22 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PREVENTION AND REDUCTION OF VIOLENCE AND VIOLENT CONFLICT IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO: • INDIVIDUALS AFFECTED BY VIOLENCE IN THE COMMUNITY OR WORKPLACE; • INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS WHO WORK WITH THOSE AFFECTED BY VIOLENCE AND/OR VIOLENT CONFLICT; AND • THOSE WHOSE ACTIVITIES IMPACT ON THE PREVENTION AND REDUCTION VIOLENCE AND VIOLENT CONFLICT PROVIDED THAT ALL ACTIVITIES SHALL BE BALANCED AND IMPARTIAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o UHY Hacker Young
168 Church Road
HOVE
East Sussex
BN3 2DL
- Phone:
- 00447475714188
- Email:
- info@openedge.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.