Financial history THE SOHO RECOVERY CENTRE

Charity number: 1168812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £106.15k £47.29k £49.56k £123.72k £102.13k
Total expenditure £88.08k £53.36k £89.02k £106.99k £115.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.23k N/A £3.00k N/A