Trustees THE SOHO RECOVERY CENTRE
Charity number: 1168812

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Sheahan | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anabel Moore-Brabazon | Trustee | 04 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
George Boyd | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Withey | Trustee | 17 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALEX ILIADIS-KOUTSIKOS | Trustee | 17 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH TOWNLEY | Trustee | 17 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN MICHAEL MACLELLAN | Trustee | 17 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.