AIM HIGHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
"Empowering neurodiverse children, young people and their families across Hull and East Riding of Yorkshire." We are dedicated to providing neurodiversity, mental health, and educational support for families of children and young people aged 0-25 years. With a special focus on autism, we strive to create an inclusive and supportive community where every individual can thrive.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2024
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 23 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hayley Collinson | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clair Samson | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Todd | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Scarlet Karina Leedham | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Beilby | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2020 | 01/08/2021 | 01/08/2022 | 01/08/2023 | 01/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.01k | £15.29k | £39.43k | £58.84k | £96.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.55k | £8.53k | £30.61k | £44.65k | £80.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Sep 2016 as amended on 23 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
PROMOTING SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS UP TO THE AGE OF 25 WITH AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDERS (ASC) AND/OR MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THEIR DISABILITIES BY: 1. EMPOWERING FAMILIES FACING ASC AND/OR MENTAL HEALTH AND EDUCATIONAL BARRIERS; 2. PROVIDING EDUCATION AND INFORMATIVE SUPPORT TO ENABLE MAXIMUM EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES; 3. RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS UP TO THE AGE OF 25 WITH ASC AND /OR MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS IN RELATION TO THEIR EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL EXCLUSION; 4. ADMINISTRATING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES AFFECTED BY ASC AND/OR MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS; 5. ADMINISTRATING RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES AFFECTED BY ASC AND/OR MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 ALBION STREET
HULL
HU1 3TG
- Phone:
- 07980915161
- Email:
- aimhigher2016@outlook.com
- Website:
-
aimhigher.online
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window