Accounts and annual returns WORCESTER MUSLIM WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 508607
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 September 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 06 September 2016 On Time