REFUGEE WOMEN OF BRISTOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main activity is a drop-in centre 1 day per week open to all refugee and asylum seeking women in Bristol. The drop-in centre provides education, advice, information, support, social activities and training, volunteer and employment opportunities to refugee women. We also participate in local events and forums to give a voice to refugee women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £28,085 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
31 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 February 2017: CIO registration
- 26 April 2018: Funds received from 1135727 REFUGEE WOMEN OF BRISTOL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mirfat Mohamed Elmustafa Shamat | Chair | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amira Mohamoud Ahmed | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rim Salah | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Efeturi Winifred Orogun | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hibo Elmi | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abir Ahmed | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jouwiryaiman Almaktary | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shazia Akhtar | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aminata Coulibali | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Safa Omer | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.04k | £193.92k | £202.02k | £208.89k | £204.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.32k | £154.47k | £172.04k | £182.17k | £193.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.92k | £30.00k | £161.27k | £29.07k | £28.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF REFUGEE WOMEN AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM IN BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Refugee Women Of Bristol
Unit 35
Easton Business Centre
Felix Road
BRISTOL
BS5 0HE
- Phone:
- 0117 9415867
- Website:
-
www@refugeewomenofbristol.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window