CAENHILL COUNTRYSIDE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Caenhill Countryside Centre charity is a project that operates as a rural learning centre. It supports children, young people and communities where they can learn outside working with animals, agriculture, horticulture and rural skills and crafts. It helps young people on their pathways forward for their chosen skills, activities and future life and community groups to help support and learn
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,750 from 8 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 04 April 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola King | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DOUGLAS HAMS | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
NEIL GOLLEGE | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS HELIE FRANKLIN | Trustee | 13 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS FRANKLIN | Trustee | 13 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.67k | £49.34k | £52.45k | £34.88k | £45.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.61k | £40.61k | £45.36k | £52.93k | £42.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.25k | £13.78k | £23.40k | £4.87k | £6.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE AND RURAL SKILLS; 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARSH FARM COTTAGE
CAEN HILL
DEVIZES
SN10 5TF
- Phone:
- 01380723698
- Email:
- caenhillcc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window