Stories For Life

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stories for Life records life stories face to face or remotely with those who are in the last chapter of life in a variety of settings; hospices, hospitals, care homes or in their own homes. Our biographers are specialist volunteers trained by us. Our phone service can include the recording of less formally structured conversations between family members/ friends of a different generation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 October 2016: CIO registration
- THE HOSPICE BIOGRAPHERS (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ayla Ronald | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Usiskin | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Loutsis | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Greenwood | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yos Noor | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ALTOUNYAN | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.79k | £32.64k | £21.43k | £81.80k | £41.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.07k | £21.02k | £26.60k | £42.62k | £41.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 18 OCT 2016 AMENDED ON 07 DEC 2021 as amended on 25 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE PLEASURE AND RELIEF TO ALL THOSE NEARING THE END OF THEIR LIVES, YOUNG & OLD, BY PROFESSIONALLY RECORDING THEIR PRECIOUS MEMORIES IN A VARIETY OF DIFFERENT WAYS AND ON AUDIO OR VIDEO, FREE OF CHARGE IN THE U.K.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 COMBEMARTIN ROAD
LONDON
SW18 5PP
- Phone:
- 07712534399
- Email:
- hello@storiesforlife.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window