ZUBEIDA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Zubeida Charitable Trust is a general purpose charity and aims to support a range of charitable causes for the public benefit. The main focus being on i/ humanitarian relief and development via financial or other aid; ii/ educational aid, religious (Islamic) and secular; iii/ medical aid. As ZCT is a small charity we generally work by providing grants to other larger UK registered charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Albania
- Bangladesh
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Burma
- Egypt
- India
- Indonesia
- Iraq
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Libya
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Niger
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Syria
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Turkey
- Uganda
- Yemen
- Zambia
Governance
- 02 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohamed Patel | Chair | 01 July 2016 |
|
|||||
IMRAN PATEL | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
AYUB PATEL | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
HAMMAAD PATEL MPHARM | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.80k | £39.75k | £49.11k | £49.54k | £83.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.30k | £34.78k | £55.59k | £62.81k | £69.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £951 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER OR CATASTROPHE BY SUPPLYING THEM WITH FINANCIAL OR OTHER AID. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ALL ITS FORMS INCLUDING RELIGIOUS (ISLAMIC) AND SECULAR IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO WISH TO ACHIEVE A BETTER QUALITY OF SPIRITUAL AND MUNDANE LIFE BY PROVIDING THEM WITH FINANCIAL OR OTHER AID.
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 EDINBURGH ROAD
LONDON
E17 7QB
- Phone:
- 07877136033
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window