ASHBY-DE-LE-ZOUCH RELIEF IN SICKNESS FUND

Charity Number: 508621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

small grants for the relief of those ill or caring for sick people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,242
Total expenditure: £1,036

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 May 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Avril Wilson Trustee 29 January 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Rosemary Forster Smith Trustee 30 November 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT HELEN, ASHBY-DE-LA-ZOUCH
Received: On time
Dr JOHN MARTIN VAUGHAN Trustee 18 June 2014
MEASHAM AND DISTRICT YOUTH CLUB
Received: On time
JANET ONIONS Trustee 30 November 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £889 £1.10k £1.08k £1.21k £1.24k
Total expenditure £1.44k £1.43k £370 £1.64k £1.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Crane & Walton Llp
30 South Street
ASHBY-DE-LA-ZOUCH
LE65 1BT
Phone:
01530414111
Website:

No information available