BOA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Boa Foundation is a nonprofit organization that works in alliance with indigenous communities to preserve and protect sacred land, culture and ancient wisdom. We focus on indigenous-led projects including strategic land buybacks, restoration of native ecosystems, reforestation, cultural exchange and sustainable living solutions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brazil
- Colombia
- Guatemala
- Mexico
- Peru
- United States
Governance
- 24 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephanie Alexandra Reynolds | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Remi Aruna Olajoyegbe | Trustee | 22 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
RAHSAAN NURULLAH | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £268.53k | £80.58k | £97.71k | £124.97k | £84.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £268.53k | £78.18k | £97.71k | £58.28k | £148.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF TRIBES LIVING IN THE BRAZILIAN AMAZON, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE KAXINAWA TRIBE: 1)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ECO-FRIENDLY WATER WELLS TO DELIVER CLEAN AND SAFE DRINKING WATER AND PROVIDING ECO-COMPOSTING-TOILET SYSTEMS TO REPLACE THE OUT DATED AND DANGEROUS WASTE FACILITIES CURRENTLY IN PLACE; 2)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY BUILDING VILLAGE CLASSROOMS AND PROVIDING EDUCATION AND LEARNING MATERIALS, WITH A FOCUS ON PRESERVING INDIGENOUS TRIBAL KNOWLEDGE AND PROVIDING SPECIALISED TRAINING IN PERMACULTURE DESIGN AND IMPLEMENTATION; AND 3)TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OF THE BRAZILIAN AMAZON BY LAUNCHING A LAND-RIGHTS BUYBACK PROGRAM FOR THE PRESERVATION OF THE AMAZON RAINFOREST, ENCOURAGING THE CONTINUITY OF TRIBAL RITUAL AND TRADITION TO ENSURE THE YOUNGER GENERATIONS OF THE AMAZON ARE EQUIPPED WITH INHERITED KNOWLEDGEABLE FROM THEIR ELDERS TO INSTALL ECO-FRIENDLY WATER WELLS AND COMPOSTING TOILETS, TO IMPROVE WASTE MANAGEMENT AND PREVENT POLLUTION OF RIVERS, TO EDUCATE LOCAL TRIBESMEN IN PERMACULTURE DESIGN AND IMPLEMENTATION SKILLS, TO ENCOURAGE THE USE OF SUSTAINABLE, ECO-FRIENDLY AND SELF-SUFFICIENT SYSTEMS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
groundfloor, 138 Richmond Road
LONDON
E8 3HN
- Phone:
- 00447738364336
- Email:
- theboafoundation@gmail.com
- Website:
-
theboafoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window