Accounts and annual returns BANA TANDIZO FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1170917
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 February 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 February 2021 19 days late