Financial history RIGHTPATH WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1170140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £0 £30.65k £27.47k £12.28k £18.16k
Total expenditure £0 £23.19k £29.26k £17.35k £22.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A