RIGHTPATH WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the year the charity continued to raise funds from membership fees. There are continuous commitments from the users and members to support charity's activities. It aims to provide services in advancement of health or saving of lives. Disability and prevention of poverty, social welfare to the community and promotes social awareness among the Bangladeshi community in UK and Bangladesh.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 11 November 2016: Standard registration
- RESHMA MOHILA CLINIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUHUL ISLAM | Trustee | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAMAL HUSSAIN MIAH | Trustee | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MOULANA MD ABDUL AZIZ SIDDIQUEE | Trustee | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £30.65k | £27.47k | £12.28k | £18.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £23.19k | £29.26k | £17.35k | £22.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 April 2025 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 April 2025 | 518 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 April 2025 | 518 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 02 NOV 2016 as amended on 10 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY, RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN BANGLADESH, WITH A FOCUS ON CATERING FOR THE NEEDS OF ON WOMEN/GIRLS AND YOUNG CHILDREN, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL TREATMENT, FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND CHARITABLE SUPPORT WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE 2. THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL TREATMENT, ADVICE, EDUCATION, CHARITABLE SUPPORT AND FURTHERING THE CHARITABLE WORK OF SUCH OTHER CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS WITH SIMILAR OBJECTIVES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 St. Georges Way
Wolverton
MILTON KEYNES
MK12 5EX
- Phone:
- 07980020801
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window