SOUTH HETTON INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1170195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principle object of the charity is the advancement of the Christian faith in accordance with the Statements of Faith and Practice of the Independent Methodist Connexion .The charity may also carry out other charitable purposes . Sunday and weekday services are held along with Funerals,Wedding and Baptismal services .Fund raising events throughout the year.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £40,173
Total expenditure: £42,376

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 November 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SOUTH HETTON I.M.C. (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EVA RICHARDSON B. ED. Chair 11 November 2019
None on record
BRENDA MCCABE Trustee 11 November 2019
None on record
SANDRA HECKLES Trustee 11 November 2019
None on record
MARTYN BANKS Trustee 11 November 2019
None on record
DEBORAH KLINCKE Trustee 11 November 2019
None on record
IRENE CHISHOLM Trustee 11 November 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £19.46k £10.02k £7.70k £13.04k £40.17k
Total expenditure £13.52k £8.44k £7.18k £12.22k £42.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 18 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 18 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 17 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 13 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 13 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 16 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 ABBEYDALE GARDENS
SOUTH HETTON
DURHAM
DH6 2TS
Phone:
01915262784
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available