SULEYMANIYE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity provides educational support and establish supplementary school to the children who lives in deprived area and experiences of difficulties gaining national level success due to the lack of language skills or overcrowded class sizes etc.. We are organising food bank and food aid for homeless or any vulnerable people in our area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £31,680 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 September 2017: CIO registration
- SULEYMANIYE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- ESSEX ANATOLIA EDUCATION AND CULTURAL CENTRE (Previous name)
- ESSEX ANATOLIA EDUCATION CULTURAL CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
emre acar | Chair | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
ahmet sik | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hasan Caner | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
erdal doganguzel | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.54k | £143.61k | £225.40k | £323.73k | £390.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.38k | £139.00k | £201.93k | £305.15k | £401.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £31.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2024 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2024 | 267 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Sep 2017 as amended on 18 May 2020 as amended on 26 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
1) To advance the education; a) To advance the education of the public in the subjects of English Language and Life in the UK. b) To advance the education of the pupils attending regional schools by providing and assisting in the provision of supplementary education, place and materials. c) To assist in such ways as the charity trustees think fit any charity in England whose aims include advancing education of persons under the age of 25 years by developing their mental, physical and moral capabilities through leisure time activities. 2) To advance community development; a) To further or benefit the residents of England, without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, or other opinions by associating together the said residents and the local authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with the objective of improving the conditions of life for the residents.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suleymaniye Community Association
214 Kingsland Road
LONDON
E2 8AX
- Phone:
- 02076849900
- Email:
- info@suleymaniye.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window