ROWLEY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant giving in support of women and girls
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 09 April 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH ARMSTRONG | Chair | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Blagg | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joy Majekodumni | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Whiting | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Jane Cresswell | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Winkle | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY PIGGOTT | Trustee | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGARET CLEWS | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RALPH COOKE | Trustee | 03 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH KELT | Trustee | 03 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.55k | £38.30k | £39.65k | £41.34k | £41.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.64k | £31.05k | £39.87k | £38.27k | £42.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 3 JUNE 1988 as amended on 13 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
1 PROMOTING THE REHABILITATION OF WOMEN AND GIRLS WHO ARE IN NEED OF PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR MORAL CARE; 2 RELIEVING NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AMONG WOMEN AND GIRLS; 3 PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF WOMEN AND GIRLS; 4 PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION FOR WOMEN AND GIRLS OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 5 MAKING GRANTS OR DONATIONS TO CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS HAVING FOR THEIR OBJECT THE BENEFIT OF WOMEN AND GIRLS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 BRUNSWICK TERRACE
STAFFORD
ST16 1BB
- Phone:
- 01785255512
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window