Financial history BURBAGE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1169141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £49.63k £51.51k £48.99k £49.08k £63.52k
Total expenditure £52.24k £49.79k £49.25k £62.91k £76.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.20k £110