DANSON PARK BOWLS CONSORTIUM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Consortium of 5 bowls clubs and play and use 2 greens in Danson Park, Bexleyheath, Kent. One of the clubs is for Visually Impaired bowlers. Another is a mixed bowling club where partners can participate and play together. We encourage new members to join us and can offer coaching and the loan of bowls etc. There are also a number of social activities that we arrange including holidays
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 24 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ronald Thomas John Self | Trustee | 13 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roy Frederick Clark | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Frances Marshall | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lillee | Trustee | 07 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN CLARK | Trustee | 16 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA HOBBS | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WARREN | Trustee | 04 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
EDWIN DAVIS | Trustee | 15 February 2001 |
|
|
||||
PETER COOPER | Trustee | 30 April 1993 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.52k | £32.54k | £18.20k | £19.47k | £21.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.52k | £18.58k | £19.21k | £19.50k | £21.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 13 August 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 August 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 APR 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 JUN 1999 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 03 JUL 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BEXLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING BOWLS AND ACCESS TO THE BOWLING GREENS AND PAVILION IN DANSON PARK BEXLEYHEATH
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Cleve Road
SIDCUP
Kent
DA14 4RS
- Phone:
- 07758949241
- Email:
- stevens40@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window