ONE AND TWO EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
One and two education organisation to advance the education of children in Somalia who are not attending school, in such ways as the trustees see fit, including the provision, where necessary, of school fees, exam fees, stationery i.e. information technology facility , school uniform, clean drinking water and breakfast.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somalia
Governance
- 18 October 2016: Standard registration
- ONE AND TWO EDUCATION LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdulrahiim Hussein | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
GULLED JABANE | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £615 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £509 | £350 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 December 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 AUG 2016 as amended on 22 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN SOMALIA WHO ARE NOT ATTENDING SCHOOL, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THE PROVISION, WHERE NECESSARY, OF SCHOOL FEES, EXAM FEES, STATIONERY, SCHOOL UNIFORM, CLEAN DRINKING WATER AND BREAKFAST.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
50C Coldharbour Lane
Hayes
Middlesex
London
UB3 3EP
- Phone:
- 02075664062
- Email:
- oneandtwoeducation@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window