REACHING OUT (SANDWELL) CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Reaching Out is a charity that aims to provide support to the homeless principally in the area of Wednesbury West Midlands. We aim to relieve hardship and distress by ways of provision of food, other nourishment, clothing and other items. All homeless persons can come to the shop and change into new clothing free of charge. We offer housing advice and support in which ever way we can.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sandwell
Governance
- 23 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET HARDWICK | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLOVETTE RICHARDS | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK BAADJES | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Winsome Baadjes | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL BROWN | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PENNY MASON | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA PHIPPS | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.61k | £10.00k | £3.81k | £11.78k | £6.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.41k | £1.41k | £2.86k | £7.15k | £7.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF HOMELESS PERSONS IN SANDWELL, PRINCIPALLY IN THE AREA OF WEDNESBURY, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE PROVISION OF FOOD, OTHER NOURISHMENT, CLOTHING AND OTHER ITEMS; B) THE PROVISION OF ADMINISTRATION SERVICES WHERE REQUIRED; C) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE REGARDING ACCESSING ACCOMMODATION; D) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; E) PROVIDING FUNDS RAISED FROM A CHARITY SHOP, WHICH SELLS WHOLLY DONATED GOODS, FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 WOLSELEY ROAD
WEST BROMWICH
B70 0LS
- Phone:
- 07727270753
- Email:
- newlifeinhilltop@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window