VITILIGO SUPPORT UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing information, support and advocacy to people in the United Kingdom in relation to their vitiligo, including disseminating research, advising on accessing treatments and the efficacy of treatments when supported by research, replying to messages, arranging MeetUps around the UK and in London and providing newsletters and information sheets to advise on key areas of vitiligo treatment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA RUSH | Chair | 01 July 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr Catherine Dale | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID RUSH | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.60k | £84 | £84 | £1.29k | £355 | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.60k | £84 | £84 | £101 | £45 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 09 April 2023 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 09 April 2023 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 09 April 2023 | 432 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 09 April 2023 | 432 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 13 March 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 30 June 2021 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF VITILIGO IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO VITILIGO
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 AVONDALE AVENUE
ESHER
KT10 0DA
- Phone:
- 07976230802
- Email:
- info@vitiligosupport.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window