PRIMARY INSPIRATION THROUGH ENTERPRISE(PIE) PROJECT TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity helps realise ambitions and raise aspirations in children and young people. Using enterprise as the key activator to bring education to life, delivering enterprise activities into schools underpinned by a formal enterprise qualification. All stakeholders are engaged, involved and supported including parents, pupils, teachers and local businesses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 September 2016: Standard registration
- PIE PROJECT TRUST (Working name)
- PRIMARY INSPIRATION THROUGH ENTERPRISE(PIE) PROJECT TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Richard Andrew | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Marchant | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Benjamin Eves | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Joanne Minnikin | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Col Andrew Black | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PAUL STEVEN KLEISER MBA | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
AMMAR YUSUF MIRZA CBE | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.62k | £6.91k | £5.23k | £7.30k | £11.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.82k | £4.62k | £3.66k | £6.53k | £6.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 June 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 June 2021 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 June 2021 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC (PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE WITHIN, THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND) BY ENCOURAGING THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN AND CONTRIBUTE TO THE ACTIVITIES OF AN ENTERPRISE EDUCATION SERVICE AND TO VALUE IT FOR THE POSITIVE IMPACT THAT IT MAKES UPON THEIR LIVES; 2. TO ADVANCE SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING, ARTS AND MATHEMATICS BY SUPPORTING SCHOOLS TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A WORLD CLASS ENTERPRISE EDUCATION SERVICE THAT IS ACCESSIBLE BY ALL AND ENLIGHTENING; 3. TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP BY SUPPORTING SCHOOLS AND EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS TO HELP TO EQUIP PEOPLE WITH THE CAPACITY TO UNDERSTAND AND OPERATE SUCCESSFULLY IN SOCIETY; AND 4. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY CONSISTENT WITH THE OBJECTS ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PIE Project
17 Main Street
Ponteland
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE20 9NH
- Phone:
- 08442477704
- Email:
- info@pieproject.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window