Trustees PRIMARY INSPIRATION THROUGH ENTERPRISE(PIE) PROJECT TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1169362

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Richard Andrew | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Marchant | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Benjamin Eves | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Joanne Minnikin | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Col Andrew Black | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PAUL STEVEN KLEISER MBA | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
AMMAR YUSUF MIRZA CBE | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.