FIRST LADIES(BARKING AND DAGENHAM) WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities are in line with the National Federation of Women's Institutes. At the monthly main meeting we usually have a guest speaker or an activity of interest to our members. During the month further sub groups are held at members' homes or at a suitable location for the activity. E.g. textile or paper crafts, book club, theatre outings, choir, walking group, coffee club, games group etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 24 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bonnie Holland | Chair | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Savage | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
DORA BOWES | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.06k | £4.37k | £7.40k | £8.21k | £12.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.50k | £3.48k | £7.40k | £7.53k | £12.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE WI ARE TO FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 SPRINGPOND ROAD
DAGENHAM
RM9 5DP
- Phone:
- 07984439019
- Email:
- wifirstladies@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window