Accounts and annual returns CARDIFF BOOK FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1171146
Charity reporting is overdue by 1074 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 343 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 343 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 709 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 709 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1074 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1074 days
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 02 July 2021 32 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 September 2020 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 September 2020 122 days late Download Open in new window