KINGTON WALKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Kington Walks CIO is to promote community participation in healthy recreation by encouraging and enabling people to partake in regular walks as a form of exercise in Kington and the surrounding area. The activities managed by the charity include two walking festivals engaging with local primary schools to encourage walking activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £942 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 14 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Lee | Chair | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Mavis Burden | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Joy Yeomans | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin David Robinson | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Finch | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.05k | £4.78k | £8.31k | £9.36k | £10.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.07k | £3.02k | £6.53k | £12.27k | £9.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | £500 | £942 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY ENCOURAGING AND ENABLING PEOPLE TO PARTAKE IN REGULAR WALKS AS A FORM OF EXERCISE IN KINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
IN KINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 The Square
KINGTON
Herefordshire
HR5 3BA
- Phone:
- 07552087786
- Email:
- info@kingtonwalks.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window