WCCM OBLATE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The WCCM Oblate Trust is set up to advance religious and other charitable work of the WCCM Benedictine Oblate Community. To foster residential and non-residential Oblate community life and serivce to society in the Benedictine tradition and educating the public in the teaching of Christian tradition of meditation and prayer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FATHER LAURENCE FREEMAN | Chair | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE MARY PETERS | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
LEONARDO WINCK CORREA | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH TAYLOR | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
GIOVANNI FELICIONI | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JOHN TAYLOR | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.24k | £39.50k | £100 | £0 | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.70k | £8.29k | £10.50k | £10.38k | £6.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE WCCM BENEDICTINE OBLATE COMMUNITY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY PROMOTING AND FOSTERING RESIDENTIAL AND NON-RESIDENTIAL OBLATE COMMUNITY LIFE AND SERVICE TO SOCIETY IN THE BENEDICTINE TRADITION AND EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN TRADITION OF MEDITATION AND PRAYER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WCCM INTERNATIONAL CENTRE
ST MARKS
MYDDELTON SQUARE
LONDON
EC1R 1XX
- Phone:
- 02072782070
- Email:
- welcome@wccm.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window