CARMARTHENSHIRE WATER SAFETY PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leading drowning prevention work,awareness and innovation in South West Wales. Also, supporting families bereaved by drowning to achieve outcomes in memory of their loved ones. Increasing young peoples safe engagement with water through fun and education. Supporting agencies to get water safety education into schools in Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- City Of Swansea
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 24 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen James Bright | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BRIAN BAMFORTH | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Ffion Fox | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Fox | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Rees | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.92k | £12.70k | £2.51k | £3.52k | £17.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.70k | £6.20k | £5.39k | £12.02k | £14.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.15k | N/A | £450 | N/A | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 May 2022 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES IN THE CARMARTHENSHIRE, CEREDIGION, PEMBROKESHIRE AND CITY& COUNTY OF SWANSEA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EDUCATION TO THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE DANGERS OF OPEN WATERWAYS. B) MANAGING LIFE-SAVING EQUIPMENT BY HELPING TO REDUCE VANDALISM AND HELPING TO REPLACE AND RENEW LOST OR DAMAGED LIFEBUOYS & CABINETS ALONG RIVERS AND WATERWAYS. C) WORKING WITH VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY ORGANISATIONS IN THE DELIVERY OF THE ABOVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Quay Centre
The Quay
CARMARTHEN
CARMARTHENSHIRE
SA31 3LN
- Phone:
- 07791704044
- Email:
- info@cwsp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window