Financial history PENNY JONES ANIMAL HOSPICE

Charity number: 1172147
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £74.64k £133.35k £222.29k £177.27k £255.12k
Total expenditure £72.57k £107.61k £173.42k £247.38k £227.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A