EMERGE ADVOCACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Emerge Advocacy provides support to young people aged 10 - 25 who attend A&E because they have self-harmed or are suicidal. Our presence helps reduce anxiety for young people during a very distressing time. We are available when needed most, often late into the night and provide up to three months follow up support post discharge. Emerge: A Voice of Hope
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £229,157 from 7 government contract(s) and £22,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 March 2017: CIO registration
- 06 September 2023: Funds received from 1173056 THINKTWICE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin McCormac OBE | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Broadhurst | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Stafford-Smith | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Kendall | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOY WRIGHT | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Watts | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.05k | £87.59k | £170.20k | £356.83k | £447.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.51k | £69.59k | £144.59k | £291.81k | £432.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £19.97k | £82.34k | £80.43k | £229.16k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £22.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Mar 2017 as amended on 06 Jul 2018 as amended on 15 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
As an expression of the Christian life and faith, to promote and protect good health among people, and in particular young people, suffering from mental illness or emotional distress or in need of rehabilitation as a result of such illness in an NHS setting or in the community by: a) encouraging them to engage with care and treatment. b) the provision of support, advocacy, education and preventative work. c) advancing the education of families, those working with young people and the general public in all areas relating to mental illness and emotional distress in young people. d) the provision of follow up support and activities which promote recovery and develop young people’s skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as whole and confident individuals. e) other activities in line with this, as approved by the charity trustees. As a charity, we are committed to following the example of the Christian faith by indiscriminately showing love, care and compassion to those we encounter.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
257 GRANGE ROAD
GUILDFORD
GU2 9QX
- Phone:
- 07885955847
- Email:
- info@emergeadvocacy.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window