SOCIAL MISSION INSTITUTE ("SMI")

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity has a primary focus on supporting refugees, asylum-seekers and immigrants in the United Kingdom who are from North Korea and South Korea, in each case who have need of such facilities due to their age, financial hardship and/or social circumstances. This includes grants and other support to North Korean Saturday Schools, as well as Korean traditional cultural initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- China
- North Korea
- South Korea
Governance
- 10 May 2017: CIO registration
- SMI (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONG-MIN PARK | Chair | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Seung Cheol Choi | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kangae Byeon | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUNG-HYUI PARK | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £0 | £4.76k | £0 | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.50k | £4.40k | £4.20k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 208 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 208 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 574 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 574 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 November 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 November 2020 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 May 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SUPPORT FOR PERSONS LOCATED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IMMIGRANTS, REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS FROM NORTH KOREA AND SOUTH KOREA, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AND/OR SUPPORT BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, BY MEANS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION; B) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND AWARDS TO INDIVIDUALS AS WELL AS ORGANISATIONS ADVANCING SIMILAR OR COMPLEMENTARY OBJECTS; AND C) THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL, SKILLS AND/OR OTHER TRAINING, MENTORING AND ADVICE (LEGAL OR OTHERWISE). 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN KOREAN ARTS, HERITAGE, HISTORY AND CULTURE, BY MEANS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY CLASSES, EXHIBITIONS AND CONCERTS (IN ALL CASES OPEN TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC) ON SUBJECTS INCLUDING KOREAN CALLIGRAPHY, KOREAN TRADITIONAL AND MODERN MUSIC AND DANCING, KOREAN FOOD AND KOREAN HISTORY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
286 MALDEN WAY
NEW MALDEN
KT3 5QS
- Phone:
- 07817212936
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window