HOMELESS SUPPORT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty in the Wigan and Leigh area, in particular but not exclusively, by the provision of support, food and shelter to people who are homeless or individuals in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £15,450 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 26 September 2016: CIO registration
- HSP Helping to Support People in need (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Short | Chair | 09 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sharon McCaul | Trustee | 03 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Manning | Trustee | 03 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yoko Warburton | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shahed Hayatt | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Keith Taylor | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BIBBY | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.00k | £181.09k | £233.27k | £197.72k | £246.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.41k | £134.70k | £189.44k | £213.20k | £234.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.03k | £23.10k | £68.84k | £52.76k | £15.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Sep 2016 as amended on 08 Mar 2022 as amended on 08 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE WIGAN AND LEIGH AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, FOOD AND SHELTER TO PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS OR INDIVIDUALS IN NEED.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Charles House
19-23 Charles Street
LEIGH
WN7 1DB
- Phone:
- 01942676444
- Email:
- info@hspleigh.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window