CARDIFF ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DELIVER, EACH YEAR, UP TO 20 LECTURES ON ASTRONOMICAL SUBJECTS. PARTICIPATE IN VARIOUS ASTRONOMICAL ACTIVITIES INCLUDING PUBLIC OUTREACH EVENTS. HOLD STAR PARTIES & SOLAR VIEWING EVENTS AT THE SOCIETY'S OBSERVATORY WHERE CAS MEMBERS (AND OFTEN MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC) CAN USE THE SOCIETY'S ASTRONOMICAL EQUIPMENT. MAINTAIN A WEBSITE & A LIBRARY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL INFORMATION & BOOKS ON ASTRONOMY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 31 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP JOHN WALLACE | Chair | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bradley | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Peter Titley | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS CHARLES VALENTINE POLLOCK | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr JANE DAVINA CLARK | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.40k | £3.83k | £3.16k | £4.45k | £4.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.34k | £2.40k | £1.82k | £8.13k | £4.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 31 OCT 2016 AMENDED ON 17 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE SCIENCE OF ASTRONOMY AND RELATED SUBJECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY FURTHERING THE KNOWLEDGE OF ITS MEMBERS, PROMOTING AND CONDUCTING OBSERVATIONS, AND BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR ACTIVE PARTICIPATION IN ASTRONOMICAL OBSERVATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 St. Marks Close
Llanharan
PONTYCLUN
Mid Glamorgan
CF72 9SS
- Phone:
- 07989613241
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window