NEWTON AYCLIFFE SCOUT SUPPORTERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 508664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

supporting scouting activities, community events

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,604
Total expenditure: £3,478

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 April 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Elizabeth Gray Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Susan Beadle Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
Catherine Provan Trustee 10 October 2023
1ST NEWTON AYCLIFFE SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Sharon Hutchinson Trustee 02 May 2023
1ST NEWTON AYCLIFFE SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £70.67k £3.76k £3.44k £5.88k £4.60k
Total expenditure £70.52k £4.09k £3.51k £3.16k £3.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 January 2024 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Scout Centre
Bluebell Way
NEWTON AYCLIFFE
DL5 7PW
Phone:
01325318901
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available