INTERNATIONAL EVANGELICAL CHURCH "THE GLORY"

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH EDUCATION AND EVANGELISM, IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON, AND THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM. 2. TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION OF ADULT AND YOUNG OFFENDERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT. 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, LEARNING AND TRAININGS IN PARTICULAR BU
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 November 2016: CIO registration
- EGLISE EVANGELIQUE INTERNATIONALE "LA GLOIRE" (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER KONON | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Assiome Patrick Efa | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean-Mark Kevin Wilfried Koula | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
ADELE GUELANIN MANHAN | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.39k | £6.92k | £7.01k | £8.58k | £8.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.44k | £6.68k | £6.10k | £8.65k | £8.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 17 January 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 17 January 2022 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH EDUCATION AND EVANGELISM, IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON, AND THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM. 2. TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION OF ADULT AND YOUNG OFFENDERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT. 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, LEARNING AND TRAININGS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GUIDANCE, SUPPORT AND VOCATIONAL TRAININGS. 4. TO PROMOTE PHYSICAL HEALTH AWARENESS THROUGH SEMINARS AND SPORTING ACTIVITIES, INVOLVING CHURCH MEMBERS AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY THROUGHOUT THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 MYRTLE ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 8NZ
- Phone:
- 07445261625
- Email:
- egliselagloire@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window