ABERYSTRUTH HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Aberystruth a history and archaeology society run community archaeology projects and historical projects throughout Blaenau Gwent. We have a Archaeology for all policy and work with local schools and clubs to actively get children and adults involeved in archaeology while learning about the local history in their area. We also help to promote, preserve and record archaeology and history .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Blaenau Gwent
Governance
- 28 February 2017: Standard registration
- AHAS (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ANTHONY MANNELL | Chair | 27 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN FEWINGS | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.33k | £8.55k | £623 | £869 | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.49k | £3.19k | £5.70k | £420 | £1.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 08 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 23 August 2024 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY OF THE FORMER PARISH OF ABERYSTRUTH.IN FURTHERANCE OF THE STATED OBJECT THE SOCIETY WILL;- CARRY OUT HISTORICAL RESEARCH AND ARCHAEOLOGICAL FIELDWORK (INCLUDING EXCAVATIONS, SURVEYS AND REPORTS);ALL ARCHAEOLOGICAL FIELDWORK WILL BE CARRIED OUT TO THE STANDARDS LAID DOWN BY THE INSTITUTE FOR ARCHAEOLOGISTS (IFA) AND EXCAVATION WILL ONLY BE CARRIED OUT UNDER THE SUPERVISION OF A SUITABLY QUALIFIED ARCHAEOLOGIST, I.E. A MEMBER OF THE INSTITUTE FOR ARCHAEOLOGISTS (MIFA); PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH HISTORICAL AND ARCHAEOLOGICAL RESEARCH VIA BOOKS, PAPERS, CIRCULARS, AND PERIODICALS, LECTURES, MEETINGS AND EXHIBITIONS; ARRANGE FOR THE SAFE-KEEPING OF ALL RECORDS RESULTING FROM SUCH RESEARCH AND FIELDWORK FOR THEIR EVENTUAL DEPOSITION IN THE GLAMORGAN-GWENT HISTORIC ENVIRONMENT RECORD; ARRANGE FOR THE SAFE-KEEPING OF ALL MATERIALS AND OBJECTS RECOVERED AS A RESULT OF SUCH RESEARCH AND FIELDWORK AND TO ARRANGE FOR THEIR EVENTUAL DEPOSITION IN AN APPROPRIATE ACCREDITED MUSEUM; Ò ORGANISE FIELDTRIPS, EXCURSIONS AND SITE VISITS; Ò RAISE AND ADMINISTER FUNDS TO CARRY OUT SUCH RESEARCH AND FIELDWORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 East Pentwyn
Blaina
Abertillery
NP13 3JF
- Phone:
- 07739912252
- Email:
- aberystruth.h.a.s@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window