BIRMINGHAM RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support children and adults of all genders affected by sexual violence/abuse. We offer: -Advocacy support whether you have reported or not -Counselling-including at outreach sites -Specialised counselling and group support for abused asylum seekers/refugees -Social groups-inc.women only ones -Telephone helpline -Written self-help info-inc. in Community languages -Training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Solihull
Governance
- 21 May 1979: Standard registration
- RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT (Working name)
- RSVP (Working name)
- THE PROJECT (Working name)
- BIRMINGHAM RAPE CRISIS AND RESEARCH CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Scott | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|||
SALLY PLUMB | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £535.92k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £813.59k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £208.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £21.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £8.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £505.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £438.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £12.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £16.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £362.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 NOVEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED 19 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE SUFFERED SEXUAL ASSAULT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 9558
BIRMINGHAM
B4 7QE
- Phone:
- 01216430301
- Email:
- info@rsvporg.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window