STAINTON VILLAGE HALL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stainton Village Hall CIO was created to replace an ageing village hall with a new community services hub for the inhabitants of Stainton, near Penrith, for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disablement, financial hardship or social and economic circumstances, as well as for the public generally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 13 September 2016: CIO registration
- 17 June 2017: Funds received from 517645 STAINTON VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Vivien Hodgson | Chair | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Hall | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Hall | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Ian Helm | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Golden | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Greta Johnson | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Liz Beaty | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Morley | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Chapman | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Anne Metcalf | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Philip John Dixon | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH DERBYSHIRE | Trustee | 22 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.16k | £40.20k | £20.24k | £17.46k | £20.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £204.46k | £31.61k | £21.87k | £17.08k | £13.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.75k | £17.57k | £11.91k | £3.47k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STAINTON VILLAGE CUMBRIA, AND IMMEDIATE SURROUNDING AREA ("AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stainton Village Hall
Stainton
PENRITH
Cumbria
CA11 0EP
- Phone:
- 07772247897
- Email:
- enquiries@staintonvh.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window