THE PETER PAN NURSERY FOR CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Peter Pan is the only type of nursery with the area of staffordshire which specialises in all aspects of disability for children of a pre school age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 02 April 1979: Standard registration
- 01 August 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 01 August 2011: Funds transferred to 1136915 THE PETER PAN CENTRE
- THE PETER PAN PLAYGROUP FOR CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS (Previous name)
- THE PETER PAN PLAYGROUP FOR HANDICAPPED CHILDREN (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2006 | 31/10/2007 | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | 31/10/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.33k | £135.53k | £273.00k | £167.09k | £185.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.11k | £121.01k | £130.00k | £163.46k | £170.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2010 | 12 April 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2010 | 06 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | 15 March 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | 15 March 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 07 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | 07 March 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | 28 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | 28 April 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED SEPTEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED 11 NOVEMBER 1991 AND 1 DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY FOR ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS OF PRE-SCHOOL AGE. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT AND AS ANCILLARY THERETO THE GROUP MAY:[SEE CONSTITUTION]
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window