Accounts and annual returns Q EDUCATION WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1172068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 December 2024 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 February 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required