LONE BUFFALO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND IMPROVE THE LIFE CHANCES OF THE YOUNG PEOPLE IN AND AROUND PHONSAVAN, LAOS THROUGH THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF THE LONE BUFFALO ENGLISH DEVELOPMENT CENTRE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Laos
Governance
- 13 September 2016: CIO registration
- 22 September 2017: Funds received from 1156249 LONE BUFFALO FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jackie Thomas | Chair | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gary Rolfe | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Charlton | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard John | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|||||
ANDREW MARCH | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY RICHENS | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.00k | £49.73k | £66.26k | £66.94k | £91.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.35k | £52.69k | £60.32k | £49.93k | £70.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 13 SEP 2016 AMENDED ON 07 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND IMPROVE THE LIFE CHANCES OF THE PEOPLE FROM XIANGKHOANG PROVINCE (LAOS PDR) THROUGH THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF THE LONE BUFFALO ENGLISH DEVELOPMENT CENTRE IN PHONSAVAN, WHICH PROVIDES: O ENGLISH LANGUAGE EDUCATION AND TRAINING; O SPORT AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELLBEING; O ACTIVITIES AND OTHER OPPORTUNITIES TO DEVELOP SKILLS, CAPABILITIES AND RESILIENCE OF YOUNG PEOPLE, SO THEY CAN PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; O PRESENTATIONS AND FIELD TRIPS TO INFORM PEOPLE ABOUT THEIR LOCAL COMMUNITY AND COUNTRY; O ASSISTANCE WITH VOLUNTEER PLACEMENTS IN LOCAL SERVICES AND FURTHER EDUCATION OPPORTUNITIES; AND O ADVICE AND SUPPORT NETWORKS TO FACILITATE EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Mount Harry Road
SEVENOAKS
TN13 3JH
- Phone:
- 01732457377
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window