Financial history THE JOINT MATHEMATICAL COUNCIL OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1171223
Charity reporting is up to date (99 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £12.46k £15.63k £12.11k £12.94k £23.12k
Total expenditure £6.11k £18.76k £4.46k £11.43k £17.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A