Trustees THE JOINT MATHEMATICAL COUNCIL OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Charity number: 1171223

Charity reporting is up to date (99 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Andrew John Noyes | Chair | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma-Louise Lord | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fiona Ruth Curtis | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ruth Trundley | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Beth Kelly | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Noel-Ann Emerson Bradshaw CMath | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sofya Lyakhova | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher William Chipperton | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.