Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF HIGH VIEW

Charity number: 1169196
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 20 July 2023 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 July 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 24 June 2020 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required