BIRMINGHAM HOMELESS OUTREACH

Charity number: 1169217
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

WE GO ALL AROUND BIRMINGHAM FEEDING THE HOMELESS PEOPLE WE R OUT 7 DAY AWEEK AND 3 HUNDRED AND 65 DAY A YEAR

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017

Total income: £9,095
Total expenditure: £5,934

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Cardiff
  • Coventry City
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 September 2016: CIO registration
  • 11 March 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 11 March 2025: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017
Total gross income £9.10k
Total expenditure £5.93k
Income from government contracts £0
Income from government grants £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1045 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1045 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1410 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1410 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1775 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1775 days
Submit annual return Open in new window