AFRICAN FRENCH SPEAKING COMMUNITY SUPPORT

Charity number: 1169279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Children and Young People's activities: Supplementary education, Homework Club, Sports, Recreational activities Adults and families' activities: Employability, Befriending, Sport, Entertainment, Outreach, holiday schemes Networking and Public Events in the community International Development: supporting projects in some third world countries Income generation to be reinvested in the charity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £180,888
Total expenditure: £144,054

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Angola
  • Burundi
  • Cameroon
  • Central African Republic
  • Congo
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Gabon
  • Guinea
  • Ivory Coast
  • Mali
  • Rwanda
  • Senegal
  • South Africa
  • Tanzania
  • Togo
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 September 2016: Standard registration
  • 23 September 2016: Funds received from 1145893 AFRICAN FRENCH SPEAKING COMMUNITY SUPPORT
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacques Matensi-kubanza Chair 22 December 2010
SANDWELL COUNCIL OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS (S.C.V.O.)
Received: On time
Ian Sibanda Trustee 12 January 2021
None on record
Petelo Gally Sakwanga Trustee 12 January 2021
None on record
Simplice Odette Nkonge-mbomba Trustee 12 January 2021
None on record
JASON NDUNDULA BSC HONS Trustee 22 December 2010
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.00k £226.47k £171.00k £199.47k £180.89k
Total expenditure £32.17k £110.03k £111.70k £155.08k £144.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Phillips Parish Centre
Watt Street
SMETHWICK
West Midlands
B66 3DA
Phone:
01216793354