SAL'S SHOES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sals Shoes finds new feet for predominantly preloved children's shoes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Ghana
- Kenya
- Madagascar
- Nicaragua
- Portugal
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Turkey
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 17 February 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russell Beaumont Dixon-Box | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Tantam | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Liam Alexander Roundhill | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Nelson Smith | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.62k | £117.98k | £179.40k | £202.44k | £256.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.68k | £110.44k | £163.36k | £212.87k | £229.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SHOES IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GLEBELANDS
PILGRIMS LANE
TITSEY
OXTED
RH8 0SE
- Phone:
- 07958575016
- Email:
- info@salsshoes.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window